Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Juarez Michael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Banafsheh Danesh & Javid Pc, against Barron Macgregor Sutherland, Xxxxxx Xxxxxxxxx, represented by Kalpakian Stephen Esq., Lane Dominick Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 15, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions99 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Before Trial - Lack Of Prosecution |
Case Cycle Time548 days |
Proof of Service -
Date: September 14, 2016ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER DEEMING REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE ADMITTED
Date: January 17, 2017Complaint
Date: 2015-12-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2016-04-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-04-12T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-04-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: June 07, 2017Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 23, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2016-09-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.