Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Garica Francisco Lopez, Lopez-Garcia Misael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Southwest Law Center, against Boulatian Gevork, Boulatian Misak, represented by Trafton Alan P., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Dennis J. Landin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Landin Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time783 days |
Proof of Service -
Date: July 07, 2016NOTICE TO RESCHEDULE MOTION HEARING
Date: November 17, 2016ORDER RE: MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS
Date: April 26, 2017Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Answer Filed by Gevork Boulatian (Defendant); Misak Boulatian (Defendant)
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Francisco Lopez Garica (Plaintiff); Misael Lopez-Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Document:OSC-DISMISSAL (Notice of Settlmnt) Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Francisco Lopez Garica (Plaintiff); Misael Lopez-Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Gevork Boulatian (Defendant); Misak Boulatian (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions Filed by Gevork Boulatian (Defendant); Misak Boulatian (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: February 01, 2018Receipt Filed by Gevork Boulatian (Defendant); Misak Boulatian (Defendant)
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Notice Filed by Gevork Boulatian (Defendant); Misak Boulatian (Defendant)
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: February 01, 2018Document:Motion for Sanctions Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Gevork Boulatian (Defendant); Misak Boulatian (Defendant)
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: February 01, 2018Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Order Filed by Gevork Boulatian (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Misael Lopez-Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Notice Filed by Misael Lopez-Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Notice Filed by Gevork Boulatian (Defendant); Misak Boulatian (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Gevork Boulatian (Defendant); Misak Boulatian (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-21T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Notice Filed by Gevork Boulatian (Defendant); Misak Boulatian (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Gevork Boulatian (Defendant); Misak Boulatian (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-13 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-06 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-09 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.