Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DENISE R BRAY VS CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS INC ET AL
On December 10, 2015 a premises liability (e.g.slip & fall) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Yolanda Orozco presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 10, 2015
Last Refreshed
August 24, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Holly J;Category
civil
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Premises Liability
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 years, 4 months and 15 days
Time To Trial
1 year, 11 months and 4 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Yolanda Orozco 8:30 am | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Status Conference Yolanda Orozco 8:30 am | |
May 07, 2018 | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S Filed by Lincoln S. M.D. Yee (Defendant) Filed by Lincoln S. M.D. Yee (Defendant) |
|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S Filed by Lincoln S. M.D. Yee (Defendant) |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Dismissed - Other 867 Days | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Yolanda Orozco 8:30 am | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2018-03-23 00:00:00 | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Yolanda Orozco 10:00 am | |
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
March 12, 2018 | STIPULATION BY ALL PARTIES TO STAY THE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL PENDING AN APPEAL OF COURTS ORDER GRANTTHIG OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT PAR VINDER STNGH, M.D. AND JUDGME | ||
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: STAY OF PROCEEDINGS AND/OR CONTINUANCE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION BY ALL PARTIES TO STAY THE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL PENDING AN APPEAL OF COURTS ORDER GRANTTHIG OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT PAR VINDER STNGH, M.D. AND JUDGMENT THEREON |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2018-03-09 00:00:00 | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter continued) - Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter continued) - |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Yolanda Orozco 10:00 am | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter continued) - |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Judgment Filed by: Court |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Court |
|
February 01, 2018 | NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION OF DEFENDANT PARVINDER SINGH, M.D.; F.R.C.A. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION OF DEFENDANT PARVINDER SINGH, M.D.; F.R.C.A. FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
January 18, 2018 | ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2018-01-18 00:00:00 | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Order Filed by: Court |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion for Summary Judgment Holly J. Fujie 1:30 pm | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Motion Granted Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Motion Granted |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Court |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Motion Granted |
|
January 18, 2018 | Tentative Ruling | SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT DENISE R. BRAY, Plaintiff, vs. CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC., PARVINDER SINGH, M.D., F.R.C.A., LINCOLN ...
Judge: Holly J. Fujie |
|
January 17, 2018 | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE USE OF ANY GRAPHIC EXHIBITS OR DEMONSTRATIVE EVIDENCE BEFORE PRESENTING THEM TO DEFENDANT'S COUNSE | ||
January 17, 2018 | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE RE EXPERT'S PERSONAL PRACTICES; ETC | ||
January 17, 2018 | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE RE ADMISSION OF COLLATERAL SOURCES; DECLARATION OF JULIE POLLOCK BIRDT; EXHIBIT | ||
January 17, 2018 | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE CUMULATIVE TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATED EXPERT WITNESSES; ETC | ||
January 17, 2018 | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE NON-DESIGNATED EXPERTS; DECLARATION OF JULIE POLLOCK BIRDT; EXHIBIT | ||
January 17, 2018 | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO THE REPTILE THEORY; ETC | ||
January 17, 2018 | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF PAST MEDICAL EXPENSES NOT ACTUALLY PAID BY ANY SOURCE; ETC | ||
January 17, 2018 | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE INTRODUCTION OF WITNESSES, EVIDENCE OR CONTENTIONS NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY; ETC | ||
January 17, 2018 | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE RE REFERENCE TO HYPOTHETICAL CASES OR SPECIFIC DOLLAR AMOUNTS DURING VOIR DIRE; ETC. | ||
January 17, 2018 | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO PRIOR MEDICAL MALPRACTICE ACTIONS; ETC. | ||
January 17, 2018 | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY TO THOSE OPINIONS AND FACTS EXPRESSED IN DEPOSITION; ETC. | ||
January 17, 2018 | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO FORBID USE OF MEDICAL TEXTS ON DIRECT OR DISPLAY BEFORE WITNESSES; DECLARATION OF JULIE POLLOCK BIRDT; EXHIB | ||
January 17, 2018 | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE EXCLUDING WITNESSES FROM THE COURTROOM WHO HAVE NOT YET TESTIFIED; ETC | ||
January 17, 2018 | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PRIOR OR EXISTING CLAIMS AGAINST ANY OF THE DEFENSE EXPERTS; ETC | ||
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT PLAINTIFF'S WITNESSES' TESTIMONY RE STANDARD OF CARE TO RELEVANT TIME PERIOD; ETC | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO FORBID USE OF MEDICAL TEXTS ON DIRECT OR DISPLAY BEFORE WITNESSES; DECLARATION OF JULIE POLLOCK BIRDT; EXHIBIT | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENTS RE CRITICISMS OF MEDICAL CARE; ETC | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE INTRODUCTION OF WITNESSES, EVIDENCE OR CONTENTIONS NOT DISCLOSED IN DISCOVERY; ETC | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE RE EXPERT'S PERSONAL PRACTICES; ETC | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE RE ADMISSION OF COLLATERAL SOURCES; DECLARATION OF JULIE POLLOCK BIRDT; EXHIBIT | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE CUMULATIVE TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATED EXPERT WITNESSES; ETC | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE RE REFERENCE TO HYPOTHETICAL CASES OR SPECIFIC DOLLAR AMOUNTS DURING VOIR DIRE; ETC. | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO THE REPTILE THEORY; ETC | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY TO THOSE OPINIONS AND FACTS EXPRESSED IN DEPOSITION; ETC. | |
January 17, 2018 | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENTS RE CRITICISMS OF MEDICAL CARE; ETC | ||
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE PRIOR OR EXISTING CLAIMS AGAINST ANY OF THE DEFENSE EXPERTS; ETC | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE NON-DESIGNATED EXPERTS; DECLARATION OF JULIE POLLOCK BIRDT; EXHIBIT | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE USE OF ANY GRAPHIC EXHIBITS OR DEMONSTRATIVE EVIDENCE BEFORE PRESENTING THEM TO DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL OUTSIDE THE JURY'S PRESENCE; ETC | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE EXCLUDING WITNESSES FROM THE COURTROOM WHO HAVE NOT YET TESTIFIED; ETC | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO PRIOR MEDICAL MALPRACTICE ACTIONS; ETC. | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF PAST MEDICAL EXPENSES NOT ACTUALLY PAID BY ANY SOURCE; ETC | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY TO THOSE OPINIONS AND FACTS EXPRESSED IN DEPOSITION; ETC. | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO PRIOR MEDICAL MALPRACTICE ACTIONS; ETC. | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE RE REFERENCE TO HYPOTHETICAL CASES OR SPECIFIC DOLLAR AMOUNTS DURING VOIR DIRE; ETC. | |
January 12, 2018 | Proof of Service - | ||
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | REPLY SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT, PAR VINDER SING H, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply to Motion Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | REPLY OF DEFENDANT PARVINDER SINGH, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 12, 2018 | REPLY OF DEFENDANT PARVINDER SINGH, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
January 12, 2018 | EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT PARVINDER SINGH, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
January 12, 2018 | REPLY SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT, PAR VINDER SING H, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS OF DEFENDANT PARVINDER SINGH, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply to Motion Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Lodging Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice Notice of Lodging Original Signature | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lodging Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lodging Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANT PARVINDER SINGH, M.D | |
December 29, 2017 | PLAINTIFF DENISE R. BRAY'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT PAR VINDER SINGH, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF | ||
December 29, 2017 | OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT PARVINDER SINGH, M.D.; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF RICHARD M. KATZ; BARRY N. SWERDLOW, M.D; DENTSE R. BRAY | ||
December 29, 2017 | PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANT PARVINDER S | ||
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2017-11-14 00:00:00 | |
November 14, 2017 | hearing | Calendaring:Motion for Summary Judgment Holly J. Fujie | |
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Holly J. Fujie 8:30 am | |
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Jury Trial Jury Trial |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Jury Trial |
|
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LODGING OF THE ORIGINAL DECLARATION OF KEVIN P. BECKER, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF PARVINDER SINCH, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Lodging Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 06, 2017 | NOTICE OF LODGING OF THE ORIGINAL DECLARATION OF KEVIN P. BECKER, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF PARVINDER SINCH, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lodging Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lodging Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
November 03, 2017 | Proof of Service - | ||
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT, PARVINDER SINCH, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT PARVINDER SINGH, M.D.'S FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC. | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 03, 2017 | SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT, PARVINDER SINCH, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
November 03, 2017 | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT PARVINDER SINGH, M.D.'S FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC. | ||
November 03, 2017 | DECLARATION OF VADIM BRASLAVSKY IN SUPPORT OF PARVINDER SINGH, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
November 03, 2017 | DECLARATION OF KEVIN P. BECKER, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF PARVINDER SINGH, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF VADIM BRASLAVSKY IN SUPPORT OF PARVINDER SINGH, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF KEVIN P. BECKER, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF PARVINDER SINGH, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT PARVINDER SINGH, M.D.'S FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC. | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2017-11-01 00:00:00 | |
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Holly J. Fujie 10:00 am | |
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Final Status Conference Final Status Conference |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Final Status Conference |
|
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Stipulation) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Stipulation) - |
|
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Holly J. Fujie 8:30 am | |
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2017-09-12 00:00:00 | |
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Stipulation) - |
|
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Stipulation) - Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Stipulation) - |
|
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Holly J. Fujie 10:00 am | |
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2017-09-01 00:00:00 | |
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Stipulation) - |
|
July 21, 2017 | NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT PARVINDER SINGH, M.D., F.R.C.A.'S, EX PARTE APPLICTION FOR AN ORDER TO SPECIALLY SET HIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC | ||
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT PARVINDER SINGH, M.D., F.R.C.A.'S, EX PARTE APPLICTION FOR AN ORDER TO SPECIALLY SET HIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC | |
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
July 19, 2017 | OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARONG ON MSJ, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE | ||
July 19, 2017 | ORDER RE DEFENDANT PARVINDER SINGH, M.D., F.R.C.A.'S, EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SPECIALLY SET HIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE CURRENT TRIAL DATE; ETC. | ||
July 19, 2017 | DEFENDANT PARVINDER SINGH, M.D., F.R.C.A.'S, EX PARTE APPLICTION FOR AN ORDER TO SPECIALLY SET HIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE CURRENT TRIAL DATE; OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO CONTI | ||
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2017-07-19 00:00:00 | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT PARVINDER SINGH, M.D., F.R.C.A.'S, EX PARTE APPLICTION FOR AN ORDER TO SPECIALLY SET HIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE CURRENT TRIAL DATE; OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES SO THAT SAID MOTI | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Ex Parte Motion Holly J. Fujie 8:30 am | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Order Filed by: Court |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER RE DEFENDANT PARVINDER SINGH, M.D., F.R.C.A.'S, EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SPECIALLY SET HIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE CURRENT TRIAL DATE; ETC. | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARONG ON MSJ, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Court |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER RE DEFENDANT PARVINDER SINGH, M.D., F.R.C.A.'S, EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SPECIALLY SET HIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE CURRENT TRIAL DATE; ETC. | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2017-07-13 00:00:00 | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Court Order Holly J. Fujie 8:31 am | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Court Order (Court Order; Denied) - Court Order (Court Order; Denied) - |
|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 13, 2017 | hearing | Calendaring:Non-Appearance (Case Review) Holly J. Fujie | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Court Order (Court Order; Denied) - |
|
June 26, 2017 | NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES | ||
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
June 12, 2017 | ORDER RE: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNER, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | ||
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Denied) - Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Denied) - |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion for Summary Judgment Holly J. Fujie 1:30 pm | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2017-06-12 00:00:00 | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Holly J. Fujie 8:30 am | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Order Filed by: Court |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNER, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Stipulation) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Stipulation) - |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Court |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Continued by Stipulation) - |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Denied) - |
|
June 12, 2017 | Tentative Ruling | DENISE R. BRAY, Plaintiff, vs. CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC., et al., Defendants. CASE NO.: BC603737 TENTATIVE ORDER RE: DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNER, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGM...
Judge: Holly J. Fujie |
|
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion for Summary Judgment Holly J. Fujie 1:30 pm | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2017-06-07 00:00:00 | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Continued by Court) - Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Continued by Court) - |
|
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Continued by Court) - |
|
June 02, 2017 | DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
June 02, 2017 | DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Brief-Reply Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Brief-Reply Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF BARRY SWERDLOW, M.D. | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Response Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Brief-Reply Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF BARRY SWERDLOW, M.D. | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Response Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
May 31, 2017 | Other - - Plaintiff Denise R. Bray's Notice of Lodging Original Signature Page 2 of the Declaration of Denise R. Bray in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Respondents | ||
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Denise R. Bray's Notice of Lodging Original Signature Page 2 of the Declaration of Denise R. Bray in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Respondents | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lodging Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Lodging Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lodging Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Holly J. Fujie 10:00 am | |
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Stipulation) - Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Stipulation) - |
|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Continued by Stipulation) - |
|
May 23, 2017 | PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANT CITRUS VALL | ||
May 23, 2017 | OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.; ETC. | ||
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC. | |
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.; ETC. |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC. | |
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.; ETC. |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event | EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS OF PLAINTIFF TO DECLARATION OF KAREN LOCH, R.N., LNC | |
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
April 26, 2017 | ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT) | ||
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT) | |
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT) | |
April 07, 2017 | hearing | Calendaring:Motion for Summary Judgment Holly J. Fujie | |
March 29, 2017 | NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL SIGNATURE PAGE FOR DECLARATION OF KAREN LOCH, R.N., LNC IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS | ||
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL SIGNATURE PAGE FOR DECLARATION OF KAREN LOCH, R.N., LNC IN SUPPORT OF MOTION BY DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS | |
March 23, 2017 | DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S SEPARATE VOLUME OF DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S SEPARATE VOLUME OF DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTENATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES; DECLARATIONS; EXHIBITS | |
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BY DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC. | |
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND SUPPORTING EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BY DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC. | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Motion for Summary Judgment Holly J. Fujie 1:30 pm | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NEW TRIAL AND FSC DATES | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2017-01-30 00:00:00 | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 98 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
January 23, 2017 | NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR MOTION FOR SUNMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT LINCOLN S. YEE, M.D. | ||
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Lincoln S. M.D. Yee (Defendant) Filed by Lincoln S. M.D. Yee (Defendant) |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR MOTION FOR SUNMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT LINCOLN S. YEE, M.D. | |
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR MOTION FOR SUNMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT LINCOLN S. YEE, M.D. | |
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Lincoln S. M.D. Yee (Defendant) |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT LINCOLN S. YEE, M.D.; ETC |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO SEPARATE STATEMENT AND DECLARATION OF BRADLEY GREENBAUM, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY LINCOLN S. YEE, M.D.; ETC | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Objection Document Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT LINCOLN S. YEE, M.D. | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT LINCOLN S. YEE, M.D. | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT) | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT) | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed by Lincoln S. M.D. Yee (Defendant) |
|
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed by Lincoln S. M.D. Yee (Defendant) Filed by Lincoln S. M.D. Yee (Defendant) |
|
November 09, 2016 | NOTICE OF MOTION AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT LINCOLN S. YEE, M.D.; ETC | ||
November 09, 2016 | SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT LINCOLN S. YEE, M.D. | ||
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT LINCOLN S. YEE, M.D. | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Lincoln S. M.D. Yee (Defendant) Filed by Lincoln S. M.D. Yee (Defendant) |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT LINCOLN S. YEE, M.D. | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Lincoln S. M.D. Yee (Defendant) |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Lincoln S. M.D. Yee (Defendant) |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Lincoln S. M.D. Yee (Defendant) Filed by Lincoln S. M.D. Yee (Defendant) |
|
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION OF DEFENDANT LINCOLN S. YEE, M.D.; ETC | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Parvinder, M.D. F.R.C.A. Singh (Defendant) |
|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint | |
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Lincoln S. M.D. Yee (Defendant) Filed by Lincoln S. M.D. Yee (Defendant) |
|
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Lincoln S. M.D. Yee (Defendant) |
|
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-STIPULATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY. DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC. | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION BY TRIAL ATTORNEY [FORMERLY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE COURT RULES OF COURT JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS] | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY. DEFENDANT CITRUS VALLEY HEALTH PARTNERS, INC. | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION BY TRIAL ATTORNEY [FORMERLY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE COURT RULES OF COURT JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS] | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) Filed by Citrus Valley Health Partners, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
December 14, 2015 | hearing | Calendaring:Final Status Conference Holly J. Fujie | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Filed/Opened:Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall) | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A |
|
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (MEDICAL MALPRACTICE) | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (MEDICAL MALPRACTICE) | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) Filed by Denise R. Bray (Plaintiff) |
|
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |