Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Precision Concrete, Precision Construction Group Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against 121 San Vicente Llc, Galil Associates Inc., Dover Hills Construction, represented by Chammas Jack H. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Barbara M. Scheper presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 01, 2015 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions512 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time556 days |
Proof of Service -
Date: February 27, 2017NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT 121 SAN VICENTE, LLC'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: October 12, 2016DECLARATION OF MONA J. JEFFERY IN SUPPORT OF 121 SAN VICENTE, LLC'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: October 13, 2016NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO 121 SAN VICENTE, LLC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSSCOMPLAINT
Date: October 13, 2016NOTICE OF RULING ON CROSS-DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF RIGHT TO JURY TRIAL
Date: February 16, 2017Notice
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-12-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Motion for Continuance
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-02-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-10-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Amended Proof of Service
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: June 01, 2017Declaration
Date: May 31, 2017Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: May 26, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.