Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Carrillo Roger G., filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Romero Alan J, Romero Alan J., against Children Are Our Future Inc., Linquata Doe 1 Michael, Linquata Michael, represented by Cho Christopher I., Kezios George, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Dalila Corral Lyons presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDalila Corral Lyons Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateNovember 23, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial371 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Michael Linquata (DOE 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Document:Notice-Stay Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Document:Notice-Stay Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Roger G. Carrillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Roger G. Carrillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER:) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Roger G. Carrillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Michael Linquata (DOE 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Michael Linquata (DOE 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Ruling: February 1, 2022; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Children Are Our Future, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Status Report BANKRUPTCY; Filed by: Children Are Our Future, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-28 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-02 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-09 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-12T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Status Report (BANKRUPTCY)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Status Report (Re: Bankruptcy)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER:) of )
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER:))
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order (and emailed)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Ruling: February 1, 2022
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Status Report (BANKRUPTCY STATUS REPORT BANKRUPTCY STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) ; Fi...))
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Status Report (Re: Bankruptcy)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER:) of 07/26/2019)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/29/2020)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER:))
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order (and emailed)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Children Are Our Future, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-07 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-09 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-12-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-02 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-03 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-12 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-25 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Status Report (BANKRUPTCY STATUS REPORT BANKRUPTCY STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Status Report (BANKRUPTCY)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.