Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Garcia Rosa Miriam, Robles Rene, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Chapman Christofer R. Esq., against Blt Properties Inc, Strategic Sunrise Llc, represented by Daniels Fine Israel Schonbuck & Lebovits, Wang Tommy Songfong Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Howard L. Halm presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHoward L. Halm Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management111 days |
Filing DateNovember 19, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial475 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeConsolidated (Non-Lead Case) |
Case Cycle Time229 days |
Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Document:Notice of Conference Date Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Document:Defendant's Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-12-09T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Rosa Miriam Garcia (Plaintiff); Rene Robles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by Strategic Sunrise, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Conference Date Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Strategic Sunrise, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Blt Properties, Inc (Defendant)
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Rosa Miriam Garcia (Plaintiff); Rene Robles (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Conference Date
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Steven J. Kleifield 9:30 am | |
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2017-03-08 00:00:00 | |
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 53 Jury Trial Jury Trial |
|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 53 Jury Trial |
|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Steven J. Kleifield 9:00 am | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2017-02-23 00:00:00 | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 53 Final Status Conference Final Status Conference |
|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 53 Final Status Conference |
|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Michael P. Linfield 8:35 am | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-10-17 00:00:00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.