Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Clemente Lida, Lida Clemente Trustapril 5 1976, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case against Gaudenti Anthony, Gaudenti Dennis A., Gaudenti Jr. Daniel R., Loguercio Frances, represented by Rodnunsky & Associates, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael J. Raphael presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 10, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time779 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: April 10, 2017(1) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC
Date: August 19, 2016RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 19, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT
Date: October 13, 2016AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: August 02, 2016DEFENDANT FRANCES LOGUERCIO'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: August 23, 2016FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; 2. FRAUD; ETC.
Date: January 24, 2017DEFENDANTS ANTHONY GAUDENTI AND FRANCES LOGUERCIO'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 27, 2017AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: March 23, 2017DEFENDANT DANIEL GAUDENTI'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 02, 2017DEFENDANT DENNIS GAUDENTI'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 04, 2017Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-14 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-10 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-01 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-31 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-09 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-03 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-12 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-07-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-26 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-08-02T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-17 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-10 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-19 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-08-23T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-08-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: December 28, 2017Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-06 00:00:00
Date: February 06, 2018Minute order entered: 2017-09-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-08 00:00:00
Date: December 08, 2017Minute order entered: 2017-08-09 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: December 11, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.