Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mcgeary Pamela, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of C. Ray Carlson, against Theodosopoulos David, Theodosopoulos Matthew Doe 1, represented by Liebhaber Jack M. Esq., Schubert Sally L. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHolly J. Fujie Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions335 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time787 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS; ETC.
Date: August 16, 2016REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2016ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO QUASH
Date: September 19, 2016DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC.
Date: February 09, 2017PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 14, 2017ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 03, 2017PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION TO ADVANCE HEARING ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE
Date: September 14, 2017REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT
Date: August 16, 2016NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT; ETC.
Date: August 16, 2016ANSWER OF DEFENDANT MATTHEW THEODOSOPOULOS TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: October 05, 2016Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: December 15, 2017Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-18T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Document:Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-02T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-10-20T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-04T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by Pamela McGeary (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Notice Filed by David Theodosopoulos (Defendant)
Date: 2016-02-04T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Pamela McGeary (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-11-18T00:00:00Receipt Filed by David Theodosopoulos (Defendant)
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Pamela McGeary (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-02T00:00:00Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Pamela McGeary (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by David Theodosopoulos (Defendant)
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Motion to Quash Filed by David Theodosopoulos (Defendant); Theodosopoulos, Matthew (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Pamela McGeary (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-10-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by David Theodosopoulos (Defendant)
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Demurrer Filed by David Theodosopoulos (Defendant); Theodosopoulos, Matthew (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Reply to Motion Filed by David Theodosopoulos (Defendant); Theodosopoulos, Matthew (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Answer Filed by Theodosopoulos, Matthew (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00Notice Filed by David Theodosopoulos (Defendant); Theodosopoulos, Matthew (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by David Theodosopoulos (Defendant); Theodosopoulos, Matthew (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Pamela McGeary (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Pamela McGeary (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Reply to Motion Filed by David Theodosopoulos (Defendant); Theodosopoulos, Matthew (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Pamela McGeary (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Pamela McGeary (Plaintiff)
Date: December 15, 2017Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Pamela McGeary (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Declaration Filed by David Theodosopoulos (Defendant); Theodosopoulos, Matthew (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Pamela McGeary (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Statement of Facts Filed by Pamela McGeary (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Court
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Motion Filed by David Theodosopoulos (Defendant); Theodosopoulos, Matthew (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-10-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-11-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-02-04T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-09-02T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2017-06-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: December 15, 2017Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.