Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Baum D.D.S. Gary filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Yazdi Mohammadreza D.D.S., represented by Marks Paul S. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 08, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions979 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeArbitration Award |
Case Cycle Time979 days |
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD
Date: April 20, 2018Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed B292125; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-10-08T00:00:00Document:Order to Appear for Examination Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Petition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Document:Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Appeal Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Document:Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Order RE MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO POST-JUDGMENT INTERROGATORIES; Filed by:
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Document:Abstract - misc Issued Filed by: Attorney for Creditor
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs on Appeal; Filed by: Gabriel Robles (Legacy Party)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Document:Writ-Other Issued Filed by: Attorney for Creditor
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-10-08T00:00:00Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Designation of Record Filed by: Attorney for Appellant
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Blakely Robles (Legacy Party)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Objection to Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Mohammadreza, D.D.S. Yazdi (Defendant)
Date: October 11, 2023Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Gabriel Robles (Legacy Party)
Date: 2023-09-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 27, 2022Declaration - of Robert L. Luty in Opposition to Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award
Date: April 30, 2018Opposition - to Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award
Date: April 30, 2018DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD
Date: May 02, 2018REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD
Date: May 11, 2018Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWER TO POST JUDGMENT INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 30, 2018Order - ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO POST-JUDGMENT INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 25, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING RE MOTIONS TO COMPEL)
Date: March 25, 2019Application
Date: 2015-10-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Application (AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT)
Date: 2015-11-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-31 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-09 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-10-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-27 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2016-04-25T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Answer to Post-Judgment demand for Identification and Production of Documents)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Declaration (in support of accrued interest for issuance of writ of execution)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Memorandum (of Costs on Appeal)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Answer to Post Judgment Interrogatories)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING RE MOTIONS TO COMPEL))
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B292125)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Writ-Other Issued
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CO...))
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2016-04-25T00:00:00Application
Date: 2015-11-17T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Document:Notice-Stay Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-04-25T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CO...))
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Answer to Post-Judgment demand for Identification and Production of Documents)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING RE MOTIONS TO COMPEL))
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Answer to Post Judgment Interrogatories)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Memorandum (of Costs on Appeal)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B292125)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.