Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Chang David, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Freidenberg Lauren Ida, Henriks Yana Gayane, against Biniwale Manoj A. M.D., Good Samaritan Hospital, Lee Mi-Jeong M.D., Sardesai Smeeta M.D., represented by Cynowiec Jessica E., Mckenna Robert Lowell Iii, Watson Alexander M, James Adam Robert Esq., Martino Alexandra Concetta, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with David Sotelo presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management637 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions310 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time1773 days |
Document:Order Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-08T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-09T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: David Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Good Samaritan Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-12T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: David Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-15T00:00:00Document:Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Document:Exhibit Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-23T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-14T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-15T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Document:Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-10-30T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-15T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Document:CCP 170.6 Application Filed Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Opposition TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE; Filed by: Good Samaritan Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Document:CCP 170.6 Application Filed Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Document:Exhibit Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial; Filed by: Good Samaritan Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Answer to Third Amended Complaint; Filed by: Manoj A. M.D. Biniwale (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Document:Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by: Good Samaritan Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Document:Supplemental Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Manoj A. M.D. Biniwale (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mi-Jeong M.D. Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Good Samaritan Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Good Samaritan Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: M.D. Sardesal. Smeeta. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to Correct the Record; Filed by: David Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Declaration OF CATHY GONZALEZ, ESQ. RE EX PARTE NOTICE; Filed by: David Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Manoj A. M.D. Biniwale (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Answer to Third Amended Complaint; Filed by: Mi-Jeong M.D. Lee (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Order Granting Ex Parte Application; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Good Samaritan Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Good Samaritan Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Order (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE 3AC; Filed by: David Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Re Motion For Leave To File Third Amended Complaint; Filed by: David Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Good Samaritan Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Good Samaritan Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: David Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Good Samaritan Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: David Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: David Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Good Samaritan Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: David Chang (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Manoj A. M.D. Biniwale (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 06, 2017Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: October 15, 2018Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: May 26, 2020EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 13, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SMEETA SARDESAI, M.D.; ETC.
Date: September 13, 2016NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 14, 2016NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OFF CALENDAR
Date: September 19, 2016OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 21, 2016DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 23, 2016RULING RE: DENIED; SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION
Date: December 01, 2016EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: December 08, 2016DEFENDANT MANOJ A. BINI WALE, M.D.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION;ETC.
Date: December 08, 2016DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 REGARDING CROSS EXAMINATION OF WITNESSES
Date: February 08, 2018DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 REGARDING EXPERTS' PERSONAL PRACTICES
Date: February 08, 2018PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 25, 2018Order - Order (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE 3AC
Date: October 23, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : Motion for Leave)
Date: October 22, 2018Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling Re Motion For Leave To File Third Amended Complaint
Date: November 07, 2018Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: November 16, 2018Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: August 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES)
Date: October 28, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 31, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE POST ADR; HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJ...)
Date: November 14, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; STATUS CONFERENCE...)
Date: December 17, 2019RULING RE: DEFENDANT GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL'S DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 05, 2016ANSWER OF DEFENDANT GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 22, 2016Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Document:Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-15T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Document:Mtn for Summary Adjud of Issues Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-09-30T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-09T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-15T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-08-05T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Document:Supplemental Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Document:Motion for Leave Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-11-04T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Declaration DANEIL K. DIK; Filed by: Good Samaritan Hospital (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 06, 2016ANSWER OF DEFENDANT GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 13, 2016DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 28, 2016STIPULATION STRIKING PORTIONS FROM PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2016Complaint - Third Amended Complaint For Damages 1. Professional Negligence (Medical Malpractice)
Date: November 07, 2018Answer - Answer to Third Amended Complaint
Date: December 03, 2018Answer - Answer to Third Amended Complaint
Date: December 12, 2018Complaint
Date: 2015-09-30T00:00:00Application
Date: 2015-10-30T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2015-11-04T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-11-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-12-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-01-15T00:00:00Request
Date: 2016-01-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-01-15T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2016-01-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-02-09T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-01-15T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2016-02-19T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-14 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-29 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-23 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-04-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-05-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-12 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-27 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-24 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN NO. 2 REGARDING LIMITATIONS LIMINE MICRA
Date: February 08, 2018DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE MEDICAL TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFF AND LAY WITNESSES
Date: February 08, 2018DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 REGARDING EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANT'S LIABILITY INSURANCE
Date: February 08, 2018DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO LIMIT EXPERT TESTIMONY
Date: February 08, 2018DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 REGARDING DISCUSSIONS OF MICRA LIMITATIONS
Date: February 08, 2018DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIM1NE NO. 8 PRECLUDING MENTION OF PRIOR MALPRACTICE ACTIONS
Date: February 08, 2018DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9 PRECLUDING USE OF CACI NO. 430 ON CAUSATION
Date: February 08, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion for Leave))
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Order ((PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE 3AC)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling on Submitted Matter Taken under submission 10/22/18;))
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Correct the Record)
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CORRECT THE RECORD RE INA...))
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Declaration (OF CATHY GONZALEZ, ESQ. RE EX PARTE NOTICE)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer (Portions Of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (To Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re Motion For Leave To File Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint For Damages 1. Professional Negligence (Medical Malpractice)
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Declaration (DANEIL K. DIK)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ((Defendant's Ex Parte Application of Good Samaritan Hospital t...))
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Answer (to Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Answer to Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Include Claim for Punitive Damages)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Leave to Amen...))
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/20/2019)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Opposition ( to Demurrer)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Reply (GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion t...))
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Form Interrogatory 17.1)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Answer (DEFENDANT GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (OF SEPARATELY BOUND DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Other - (DEFENDANT GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Opposition ( to Defendant Good Samaritan Hospital's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Declaration ( of Yana Henriks iso P Opp to D Good Samaritan Hospital's MSJ)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Declaration ( of Mira Chang iso P Opp to D Good Samaritan Hospital's MSJ)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of David Chang iso P Opp to D Good Samaritan Hospital's MSJ)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice ((Index of Exhibits iso P Opp to D Good Samaritan Hospital's MSJ)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Declaration ( of Maureen Sims iso P Opp to D Good Samaritan Hospital's MSJ)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Post ADR; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adj...))
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication; Status Conference...))
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Judgment (JUDGMENT RE: DEFENDANT GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Order (ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-12 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-12T00:00:00Response
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-08-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-05 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Response
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-13 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-15 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-09-19T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Amended Answer to Complaint
Date: 2016-10-13T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Response
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-11-17T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-01 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Order (Granting Plaintiffs' Notice of Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Expert Exchange Deadline)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Continuation of the FSC and Tr...))
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (AT NON- APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW REGARDING CONTINUATION OF FSC AND TRIAL DATE)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIP & ORDER RE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: STIPULATION RE: GOOD FAITH SET...))
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Approval of Minor's Compromise with Annuity Funding Deadline)
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (As to Defendant Manoj A. M.D Biniwale Only)
Date: 2020-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Approval of Minor's Compr...))
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re: Need to Hear Matter on Ex Parte Basis)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim ("Amended")
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise; Order to S...))
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With prejudice, Entire Action)
Date: August 07, 2020Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account
Date: August 07, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.