Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ocampo Jose, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Jacobson & Associates, against New Cingular Wireles Pcs Llc, Church Ashanti, represented by Soofi Rabeh M.A. Esq, Davis Gleam O. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions508 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Before Trial - Lack Of Prosecution |
Case Cycle Time669 days |
Answer
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-09-14T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2015-09-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-11-17T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-03-29T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Proof-Personal Service
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Amended Answer to Complaint
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2017-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Order
Date: May 08, 2017Notice of Ruling
Date: May 16, 2017Order
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.