Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rothman Barry K., filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Rothman Barry K., against David R. Fett M.D. Inc., Fett David R. M.D., Fett M.D. David R., Mcelroy Terry, Mcelroy Terry Doe 1, (total of 5) See All represented by Ames Dennis K., Hall Hieatt & Connely Llp, La Follette Johnson De Haas Fesler, La Follette Johnson De Haas Fesler Et Al, La Follette Johnson De Haasfesler Et Al, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mitchell L. Beckloff presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management454 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions657 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Before Trial - Lack Of Prosecution |
Case Cycle Time1025 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 30, 2016PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: September 21, 2016Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) -
Date: October 04, 2016AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: July 08, 2016SUMMONS ON VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 11, 2016NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC
Date: August 08, 2016PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 14, 2016REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 20, 2016Complaint
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-11-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-02-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-01-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-09-14T00:00:00Motion-Continue Hearing Date
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-09-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION )
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Objection Document Filed (AND OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER )
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (TO DEMURRER )
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEMURRE TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER )
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Response (TO MOTION TO STRIKE )
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Motion (AND MOTION TO STRIKE )
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00Notice (OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER )
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Notice (OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES )
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL )
Date: 2017-04-20T00:00:00General Denial (BEHALF OF: TERRY Mcelroy )
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Answer to Third Amended Complaint (BEHALF OF: TERRY McELROY )
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Stay (OF PROCEEDINGS )
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Answer to Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; )
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 97 (OSC RE Dismissal; Transferred to different departmnt) - |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department M (OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg.; OSC held & case dismissed) - |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department WEM, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg. (RE DISMISSAL OF REMAININGDEFENDANT TERRY MCELROY) - OSC held & case dismissed Judge: Mitchell L. Beckloff |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department M Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department WEM, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg. - OSC held & continued Judge: Mitchell L. Beckloff |
|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department M Trial Setting Conference (Trial Setting Conference; Court Makes Order) - |
|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department WEM, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding Trial Setting Conference (AS TO TERRY MCELROY ONLY;) - Court Makes Order Judge: Mitchell L. Beckloff |
|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department M Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department M Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department WEM, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding Non-Appearance (Case Review) - Court Makes Order Judge: Mitchell L. Beckloff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.