Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jensen Steven, Kerr Clarence, Kerr Kristen, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Smith Jeremy, against Kerr Clarence, Kerr Kristen, Medrano Manuel A., Pekarcik Victor, represented by Cargain Aaron M., Chamberlain Harry W. Ii, Galliani Fritzie, Stellwagen Robert H. Jr., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth Allen White presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Allen White Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management929 days |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions70 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-13T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-25T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-17T00:00:00Document:Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-09-17T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-26T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-04T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-11-03T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-10-16T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-30T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-30T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-30T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-11-18T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-18T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-08T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-08T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lien Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-19T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-10T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-15T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Document:OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Document:Petition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-03-30T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-04-12T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-18T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-08T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Manuel A. Medrano (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order Continuing Hearing Dates to ) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Cross-Defendant's Answer to First Amended Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Clarence Kerr (Defendant); Kristen Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Defendant); Clarence Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Motion To Quash Subpoena; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash Subpeona; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Defendant); Clarence Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Ruling on Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories (); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Defendant); Clarence Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Manuel A. Medrano (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Ruling: Motion to Compel Answers at Deposition; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Manuel A. Medrano (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Victor Pekarcik (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Points & Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Document:Notice, Association of Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-10T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-05T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-19T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Document:Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Answer to Second Amended Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Cross-Complainant); As to: Steven Jensen (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Document:Motion to Quash Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Order Ruling: Demurrer to First Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Kristen Kerr; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Manuel A. Medrano (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: ATTORNEY for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Fact; Filed by: Manuel A. Medrano (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Document:First Amended Cross Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Declaration of Victor Pekarcik; Filed by: Victor Pekarcik (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) DENIED; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Clarence Kerr (Defendant); Kristen Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Summary Judgment/Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff); As to: Manuel A. Medrano (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Defendant); As to: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: Clarence Kerr (Defendant); Kristen Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Victor Pekarcik (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Declaration OF STEVEN JENSEN IN SUPPORT; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Clarence Kerr (Defendant); Kristen Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Manuel A. Medrano (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Manuel A. Medrano (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-05T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Document:Joinder Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-21T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Real Pty in Interest
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-07-21T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Document:Proof-Personal Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Defendant); Clarence Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Clarence Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Jensen's Reply ISO Motion to Compel Defendant Victor Pekarcik; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Clarence Kerr (Defendant); Kristen Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Declaration of Marc S. Strecker; Filed by: Victor Pekarcik (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Voiding of Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Clarence Kerr (Defendant); Kristen Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Ruling: Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Safeco Insurance Company of America (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Safeco Insurance Company of America (Non-Party)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Safeco Insurance Company of America (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Updated -- Motion to Quash: Filed By: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel Deposition; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff); As to: Kristen Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Brief RE: OSC RE: 5-YEAR RULE; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Ruling: Motion to Compel Attendance at Deposition and Production of Documents; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Manuel A. Medrano (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Manuel A. Medrano (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine NO. 3 PRECLUDING EVIDENCE OF INSURANCE; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition Answers) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Defendant); As to: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Steven Jensen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Kristen Kerr (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Setting a Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-08-26T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2015-09-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2015-09-30T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-09-30T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2015-09-30T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-10-13T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2015-10-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2015-10-16T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-11-03T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2015-11-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-11-05 00:00:00
Date: 2015-11-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-11-13 00:00:00
Date: 2015-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: 2015-11-18T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-08 00:00:00
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-12-10T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-14 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2016-01-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2016-01-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-28 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-02 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-02-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-08 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-02-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-11 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-17 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2016-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Response
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-03-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-30 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-30T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-04-05T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-04-05T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-04-08T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-04-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-12 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-19 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2016-04-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-05 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-17 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Opposition Points & Authorities
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Other - (Manuel A. Medrano's Index of Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Undisputed Material Fact)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (re: Manuel A. Medrano's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Motion (and Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Order (Ruling: Demurrer to First Amended Cross-Complaint filed by Kristen Kerr)
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex Parte Application for an Order Advancing the Hearing Dates...))
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Cross-Complainant Kristen Kerr's Responses to Request for Admissions, Set One)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Cross-Complainant Kristen Kerr's Responses to Request for Production, Set One)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Cross-Complainant Kristen Kerr's Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Cross-Complainant Kristen Kerr's Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Cross-Defendant's Answer to First Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Steven Jensen's Ex Parte Applicatio...))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Order Releasing Certain Evidence Obtained by District Attorney's Office)
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Opposition (To Steven Jensen's Motion To Compel Kristen Kerr's Deposition)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Separate Statement (Re: Motion for Order Compelling Defendant Victor Pekarcik's Production Of Documents)
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Motion To Quash Subpoena
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-16 00:00:00
Date: 2015-12-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-12-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous)
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpeona)
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Defendant/Cross-Com...))
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Steven Jensen's Motion f...))
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Ruling: Motion to Compel Answers at Deposition
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Other - (CROSS-DEFENDANT STEVEN JENSEN'S CONSOLIDATED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO COMPEL)
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Cross-Defendant Steven Jensen's Motion to Compel C...))
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Cross-Defendant Steven Jensen's Motion to Compel C...))
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Order Compelling Defendant Pecarcik to Produce Documents at Deposition
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal re Defendant Pecarcik; Hear...))
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-12-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-07T00:00:00Stipulation And Order Consolidating Motions To Quash Hearings And Setting Them For January 29, 2019
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant Steven Jensen's Notice of Ruling Filed January 7, 2019)
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Continuing Hearing Dates to 1/17/2019))
Date: 2019-01-09T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Quash or, In teh Alternative, Modify Depositions Subpoena)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant Clarence Kerr's Motion to Compel Further...))
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant Clarence Kerr's Motion to Compel Further...))
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Sp...))
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Ruling on Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories (2/19/19)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Defendant Clarenc...))
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Steve Jenen's Ex Parte Application to Contunue Motions for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte application for order to continue the trial)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for order to continue the tr...))
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal re Defendant Pecarcik))
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Steven Jensen's Motion f...))
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant Manuel A. Medrano's Ex Parte Application...))
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Consolidating Motions to Compel Hearings and Setting Them for May 15, 2019)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Steven Jensen's Ex Parte...))
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Discovery))
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial and Related Dates)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice (of Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Declaration (OF STEVEN JENSEN IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)) of 11/13/2019)
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Steven Jensen's Motion t...))
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant Ste...))
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Ruling: Motion to Compel Attendance at Deposition and Production of Documents
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Call))
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-29 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-08 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-02-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-03-22T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00First Amended Cross Complaint
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-06-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Rina Carmel in Support of Joinder re HUB)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (by Steven Jensen to Quash Deposition Subpoena re HUB)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (by Steven Jensen to Quash Deposition Subpoena re Safeco)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Rina Carmel in Support of Joinder)
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) Telephonic))
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Hearing on Cross-Defendant Steven Jensen's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Objection ( to Cross-Defendant Steven Jensen's Code of Civil Procedure 998 Offer to Compromise)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Objection ( to Cross-Defendant Steven Jensen's Code of Civil Procedure 998 Offer to Compromise)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (to Quash Deposition Subpoena to Safeco Ins. Co. of America)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (to Quash Deposition Subpoena to HUB International Ins. Services)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Response (K. Kerr's Response to Separate Statement re Safeco Insurance Company of America (1st Round))
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Response (K. Kerr's Response to Sheppard's Separate Statement re Hub International Ins. Services, Inc.)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Response (K. Kerr's Response to Sheppard Separate Statement re Safeco Insurance Company of America)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Response (K. Kerr Response to Separate Statement re Hub International Insurance Services, Inc.)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Response (K. Kerr's Response to Separate Statement re Safeco Ins. Co. of America (2nd round))
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Fritzie Galliani ISO K. Kerr's Omnibus Motion, etc.)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Opposition (K. Kerr's Omnibus Opposition to Jenson's Motions for Order Quashing Depo Subpoenas, etc.)
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Reply (C in Support of Specially Appearing Non-Party Safeco's Joinder to Motions to Quash)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena for Production...))
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference:))
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Proposed Order)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation And Proposed Order)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Setting a Status Conference))
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Setting a Status Conference) of 06/18/2020)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Notice (of Status Conference)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Status Report (JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING JULY 8, 2020 STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Brief (Joint Statement Regarding July 15, 2020 Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue Hearing And Filin...))
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Rescheduling of Informal Discovery Conference))
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Deposition)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Declaration (COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition Answers))
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition Answers) of 02/23/2021)
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Brief (RE: OSC RE: 5-YEAR RULE)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Brief (Defendant and Cross-Complainant Kristen Kerr's Brief Regarding Order to Show Cause re Dismissal)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition; Order to Show Cause R...))
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice (OF RULING RE: MOTION TO COMPEL KRISTEN KERR?S DEPOSITION; AND OSC RE: FIVEYEAR RULE)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue Plaintiff?s Motio...))
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT KRISTEN KERR?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")))
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion for...))
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ((Timothy McCoy))
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order for Defendant to Return Plaintiff...))
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-14 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-16 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Complaint ((2nd))
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-01 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-07-01T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-08 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2016-07-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-21 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Proof-Personal Service
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-08-05T00:00:00Joinder
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-17 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-31 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-02 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-27 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-04 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-01 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-08 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-15 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-29 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-27 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-29 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-03 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-31 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-02 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-11-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Steven Jensen's Motion t...))
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant Manuel A. Medrano's Motion for Determina...))
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (Not Entered)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant Manuel A. Medrano's Motion for Determina...))
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Order (Granting Manuel A. Medrano's Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing Continuance re Clarence Kerr's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT CLARENCE KERR?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Reply (Defendant Clarence Kerr's Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Adjudication)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Kristen Kerr in Support of Defendant Clarence Kerr's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Summary Judgment/Summary Adjudication
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant Clarence Kerr's Motion for Summary Judgm...))
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Marc S. Strecker)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (DENIED)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Victor Pekarcik)
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Order (Granting in Part Defendant Clarence Kerr's Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order to Specially Set Hearing on Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant Clarence Kerr's Ex Parte Application for...))
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Kristen Kerr in Support of Defendant Clarence Kerr's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Clarence Kerr in Support of Defendant Clarence Kerr's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Voiding of Filing
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT CLARENCE KERR?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant and Cross-Complainant Kristen Kerr's Mot...))
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Brief (Defendant Clarence Kerr's Reply Brief In Support Of Motion For Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Ruling: Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant Clarence Kerr's Motion for Summary Adjud...))
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Steven Jensen's Motion t...))
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Steven Jensen's Motion f...))
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Steven Jensen's Motion f...))
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Ruling: Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-04-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-08-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.