Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Islam Mohammed, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Beloryan Haik Armen, Shakhgeldyan Vahe, Manukyan Law Group, against Does 1 To 100, Long Beach City Of, Long Beach Police Department, Oak Ednin, Oak Ednmin, (total of 5) See All represented by Vigus Todd N. Deputy Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management857 days |
|
Filing DateMay 15, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions483 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeTransfrd To Lasc South District |
Case Cycle Time1323 days |
Answer
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases (W/15K04148 JUDGE COURT TO MAKE DETERMINATION )
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Request-Waive Court Fees
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Notice, Association of Counsel
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Answer to Complaint
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Notice (OF CRT'S ORD )
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-28 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Answer to Complaint
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2015-05-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-09 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Declaration (OF HAIK BELORYAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S "PITCHESS" MOTION )
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Order-Court Fee Waiver
Date: 2015-05-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-18 00:00:00
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES )
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT )
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-19 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Demurrer
Date: 2016-09-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Opposition Document (RE: TO PLTFFS REQUEST FOR A TRIAL CONTINUANCE AND ALL DICOVERY CUT- OFF DATES )
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI (NEW DATES: FSC 4-25-17 TD 5-5-17 )
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PITCHESS MOTION )
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING RE PITCHESS MOTION
Date: October 20, 2017Notice
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-19 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI (NEW DATES: FSC: TRIAL: )
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIP FOR good faith determination )
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Order (TRANSFERRING PI CASE TO IC COURT )
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: December 28, 2018Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date))
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: December 05, 2018Exhibit List
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Settlement (of Entire Case)
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00OPPOSITION TO PITCHESS MOTION
Date: June 06, 2017DEFENDANTS, CITY OF LONG BEACH AND EDWIN OAK'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 20, 2016Ex-Parte Application (RE: PLTFFS EXPARTE APPLICATION TO CON'T FSC AND TRIAL )
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (FOR GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION )
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH'S DEMURRER; )
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT )
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Order (OVERRULING DEMURRER )
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT ) Filed by Atty for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases (W/15K04148 JUDGE COURT TO MAKE DETERMINATION ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Notice Filed by Long Beach, City of (Defendant)
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Mohammed Islam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Notice Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by CITY OF LONG BEACH, A MINICIPALITY (Defendant); LONG BEACH POLICE DEPARTMENT (Defendant)
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Answer Filed by Long Beach, City of (Defendant)
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Mohammed Islam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-05-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Long Beach, City of (Defendant)
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Notice (OF CRT'S ORD ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Order (OVERRULING DEMURRER ) Filed by Court
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Long Beach, City of (Defendant)
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Summons Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Cross-Defendant
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Mohammed Islam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Notice Filed by Long Beach, City of (Defendant)
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Notice Filed by Mohammed Islam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES ) Filed by Atty for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees Filed by Mohammed Islam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Long Beach, City of (Defendant)
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Order Filed by Mohammed Islam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Mohammed Islam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Notice Filed by Mohammed Islam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Long Beach, City of (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Notice, Association of Counsel Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Mohammed Islam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Stipulation Filed by Defendant/Cross-Defendant
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI (NEW DATES: FSC: TRIAL: ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PITCHESS MOTION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Long Beach, City of (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Mohammed (Good Faith) Islam (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Mohammed Islam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Mohammed Islam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (FOR GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant & X-Deft
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Mohammed Islam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Mohammed Islam (Plaintiff)
Date: December 28, 2018Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by LONG BEACH CITY ATTY - VIGUS (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: December 05, 2018Ex-Parte Application Filed by LONG BEACH CITY ATTY - VIGUS (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Long Beach, City of (Defendant)
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Settlement (of Entire Case) Filed by Mohammed Islam (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Order (TRANSFERRING PI CASE TO IC COURT ) Filed by Court
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Long Beach, City of (Defendant)
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by LONG BEACH CITY ATTY - VIGUS (Legacy Party)
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by CITY OF LONG BEACH, A MINICIPALITY (Defendant); Ednin Oak (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by LONG BEACH CITY ATTY - VIGUS (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2015-05-19T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases (W/15K04148 JUDGE COURT TO MAKE DETERMINATION )
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES )
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Notice (OF CRT'S ORD )
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT )
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT )
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEFENDANT CITY OF LONG BEACH'S DEMURRER; )
Date: 2016-08-26T00:00:00Order (OVERRULING DEMURRER )
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI (NEW DATES: FSC: 2/17/17 TRIAL: 3/7/17 )
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI (NEW DATES: FSC 4-25-17 TD 5-5-17 )
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (RE: PLTFFS EXPARTE APPLICATION TO CON'T FSC AND TRIAL )
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (FOR GOOD FAITH DETERMINATION )
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Opposition Document (RE: TO PLTFFS REQUEST FOR A TRIAL CONTINUANCE AND ALL DICOVERY CUT- OFF DATES )
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIP FOR good faith determination )
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Declaration (OF HAIK BELORYAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S "PITCHESS" MOTION )
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO PITCHESS MOTION )
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Order (TRANSFERRING PI CASE TO IC COURT )
Date: 2017-06-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date))
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Settlement (of Entire Case)
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: December 05, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.