Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Vargas Bertha, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Kiefer Mark L. Esq., Silberberg Kenneth Marshall Esq., against Bioscrip Inc., Bioscrip Infusion Services Inc. Dba Bioscrip Infusion Services, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 13, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions792 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time1456 days |
Complaint
Date: 2015-05-13T00:00:00Application
Date: 2015-05-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2015-11-30T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2015-09-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Application
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-11-03T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-09-30T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2015-09-23T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-04-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-29 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2015-11-30T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-04-06T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-03 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Conditional ...))
Date: March 04, 2019Order
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise))
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: April 05, 2019Minute order entered: 2018-08-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Notice (of Commencement of Proceedings for a Court Supervised Trust)
Date: April 23, 2019Order (By the Court continuing the Petition for Compromise)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise With Specia...))
Date: February 05, 2019Notice (Notice of Continued Hearing)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Conditional ...))
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.