Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Campbell Kimberly, Kimberly Campbell By And Through Her, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Grassini Wrinkle & Johnson, Lawrence P. Grassini, Roland Wrinkle, Shepardson Marshall, Marshall Shepardson, (total of 5) See All against Arsev Inc., Arsev Inc. Dismissed 5-24-17, Chevrolet Of Montebello, General Motors Company, Rally Auto Group Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Anthony J. Parascandola, Anthony S. Thomas, Thomas M. Klein, Bowman And Brooke Llp, Parascandola Anthony J., (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Lia Martin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLia Martin Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial917 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions743 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeTransferred To Lasc Central District |
Case Cycle Time1217 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 08, 2017DECLARATION OF BRIAN HONG RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1-3
Date: May 04, 2017PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE: COLLATERAL SOURCE EVIDENCE
Date: May 04, 2017GM DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO INSPECT THE STEERING GEAR; ETC
Date: August 22, 2017ORDER RE: MOTION TO INSPECT THE STEERING GEAR
Date: October 16, 2017OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 RE: COLLATERAL SOURCE EVIDENCE
Date: October 16, 2017ORDER RE: MOTION TO AUGMENT EXPERT WITNESS LIST
Date: October 16, 2017Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY TO MOTION
Date: November 20, 2017DECLARATION OF LAR C. JOHNSON RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NO.4
Date: January 02, 2018Complaint
Date: 2015-05-12T00:00:00Document:Answer to Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Document:Request for Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Document:Request for Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Document:Verdict-Special Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Document:Amended List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Document:Amended List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Document:OSC-DISMISSAL (Notice of Settlmnt) Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Document:Amended List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Interested Party
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Reply To Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Interested Party
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Document:Petition-Hearing Minor's Compromise Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: September 10, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: 2013-01-08T00:00:00Application
Date: 2015-05-12T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-08-10T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2015-07-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-08-11T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Application
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-09-09T00:00:00Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-09-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-09-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-03 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-08 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Request for Jury Instructions
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-09 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-31 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Request for Jury Instructions
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-01 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Request for Jury Instructions
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-22T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-02T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-10T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-02-08T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-05-12T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Document:Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-07-16T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-01-08T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-11T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Document:Answer to Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-09T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-09T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Document:Request for Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-05-08T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-06T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-05-12T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Amended List of Witnesses (THIRD AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST )
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Amended List of Exhibits
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Amended List of Exhibits (FIRST AMENDED JOINT EXHIBIT LIST )
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Amended List of Witnesses
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Amended List of Witnesses (FOURTH AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST )
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Amended List of Witnesses
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Reply To Motion
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Stip & Order-use CSR (ALICIA R. DESMOND, CSR #13037 )
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-02T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-03-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Application
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: September 10, 2018Minute order entered: 2018-09-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.