Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Universal Protection Service Lp, filed a(n) Declaratory Relief Only (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton Llp, against Stone Robert, represented by Blanchard Law Group, Dion-Kindem Peter R., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Teresa Sanchez presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 29, 2015 |
CategoryDeclaratory Relief Only (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time677 days |
Complaint
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: January 03, 2017Notice
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-12-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-12-07T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: February 15, 2017Request for Dismissal
Date: March 06, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.