Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Varble Amara, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Legal Offices Of David Grey, against Crown Castle Ng West Llc, Crown Castle Usa Inc., Nachiappan Meena C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Patricia D. Nieto presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 29, 2015 |
CategoryPremise Liability (E.G., Dangerous Conditions Of Property, Slip/Trip And Fall, Dog Attack, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions426 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time540 days |
Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-06-04T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-16T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-06-24T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-06-24T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-24T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-09-09T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: October 20, 2016Cross-Complaint
Date: 2015-06-24T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 20, 2016Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2015-07-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-06-04T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2015-09-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-06-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-06-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.