Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Archila Fridda Ofelia, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kostiv & Associates P.C., against Martinez Edilberto Wilfredo, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rafael A. Ongkeko presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management226 days |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2015 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions351 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time351 days |
Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-05-27T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-05-27T00:00:00Response Filed by Fridda Ofelia Archila (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Fridda Ofelia Archila (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Fridda Ofelia Archila (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Fridda Ofelia Archila (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Fridda Ofelia Archila (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Fridda Ofelia Archila (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Fridda Ofelia Archila (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: April 14, 2016Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Fridda Ofelia Archila (Plaintiff)
Date: April 14, 2016Complaint
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-05-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Response
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: April 14, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.