Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HAN BONG LEE ET AL VS JOSEPH RISER ET AL
On April 27, 2015 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Randolph M. Hammock presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 27, 2015
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 4 months and 14 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 93 (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) - |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 93 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Off Calendar) - |
|
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 93 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) - |
|
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Han Bong Lee (Plaintiff); Micha Lee (Plaintiff) |
|
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Summons | |
June 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Han Bong Lee (Plaintiff); Micha Lee (Plaintiff) |
|
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons | |
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Han Bong Lee (Plaintiff); Micha Lee (Plaintiff) |
|
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF DAMAGES | |
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) | |
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Han Bong Lee (Plaintiff); Micha Lee (Plaintiff) |
|
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Summons |