Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KATHLEEN EVANS-FOGEL VS EMPIRECLS WORLDWIDE CHAUFFEURED SERV
On April 27, 2015 a wrongful termination (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Holly E. Kendig presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 27, 2015
Last Refreshed
August 27, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
Wrongful Termination
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
2 years, 7 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 42 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) - |
|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 42 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) - |
|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Kathleen Evans-Fogel (Plaintiff) |
|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 42 (Order to Show Cause; Trial Date Set) - |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE SANCTIONS, INCLUDING DISMISSAL, FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO APPEAR AND PROSECUTE CASE FOR APRIL 12, 2017 | |
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by EmpireCLS Worldwide Chauffeured Services (Defendant); David Seelinger (Defendant); Joey Phelps (Defendant) |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 42 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Kathleen Evans-Fogel (Plaintiff) |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SAMUEL J. WELLS IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR | |
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by EmpireCLS Worldwide Chauffeured Services (Defendant); David Seelinger (Defendant); Joey Phelps (Defendant) |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO SETTING OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING FOR MARCH 14, 2017 | |
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 42 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO FEBRUARY 2, 2017 | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by EmpireCLS Worldwide Chauffeured Services (Defendant); David Seelinger (Defendant) |
|
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 42 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 31, 2016 | NOTICE OF (1) RULING RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DEPOSITIONS AND QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS AND (2) CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONF | ||
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF (1) RULING RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DEPOSITIONS AND QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS AND (2) CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO JANUARY 11,2017 | |
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by EmpireCLS Worldwide Chauffeured Services (Defendant) |
|
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE | |
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 42 Unknown Event Type |
|
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 42 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
October 11, 2016 | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SHAIIRAM SAMIE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DEPOSITIONS AND QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS | ||
October 11, 2016 | REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DEPOSITIONS AND QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RA VE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS | ||
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reply to Motion Filed by EmpireCLS Worldwide Chauffeured Services (Defendant); David Seelinger (Defendant); Joey Phelps (Defendant) |
|
October 04, 2016 | PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO. MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS; ETC. | ||
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO. MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS; ETC. | |
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Opposition Document Filed by Kathleen Evans-Fogel (Plaintiff) |
|
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 42 (Motion to Quash; Matter continued) - |
|
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 19, 2016 | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS | ||
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS | |
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by EmpireCLS Worldwide Chauffeured Services (Defendant); David Seelinger (Defendant); Joey Phelps (Defendant) |
|
September 16, 2016 | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS | ||
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 42 Unknown Event Type |
|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by EmpireCLS Worldwide Chauffeured Services (Defendant) |
|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by EmpireCLS Worldwide Chauffeured Services (Defendant); David Seelinger (Defendant); Joey Phelps (Defendant) |
|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS | |
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 42 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DEPOSITIONS AND QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DEPOSITIONS AND QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DEPOSITIONS AND QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DEPOSITIONS AND QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SHAHRAM SAMIE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DEPOSITIONS AND QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS | |
April 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Quash Filed by EmpireCLS Worldwide Chauffeured Services (Defendant) |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by EmpireCLS Worldwide Chauffeured Services (Defendant) |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SHAHRAM SAMIE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JOEY PHELPS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE AND SUBPOENA OF ROD RAVE AND DEPOSITION NOTICE OF BRUCE CARDENAS | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Quash Filed by EmpireCLS Worldwide Chauffeured Services (Defendant); David Seelinger (Defendant); Joey Phelps (Defendant) |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by EmpireCLS Worldwide Chauffeured Services (Defendant); David Seelinger (Defendant); Joey Phelps (Defendant) |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 42 Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Court makes order) - |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Kathleen Evans-Fogel (Plaintiff) |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Kathleen Evans-Fogel (Plaintiff) |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by EmpireCLS Worldwide Chauffeured Services (Defendant) |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 42 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) - |
|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAIRE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO APPEAR | |
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by EmpireCLS Worldwide Chauffeured Services (Defendant); David Seelinger (Defendant); Joey Phelps (Defendant) |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER | |
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by EmpireCLS Worldwide Chauffeured Services (Defendant); David Seelinger (Defendant); Joey Phelps (Defendant) |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES | |
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
1N11's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer Filed by EmpireCLS Worldwide Chauffeured Services (Defendant); David Seelinger (Defendant); Joey Phelps (Defendant) |
|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES | |
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memorandum - Other Filed by EmpireCLS Worldwide Chauffeured Services (Defendant); David Seelinger (Defendant); Joey Phelps (Defendant) |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Kathleen Evans-Fogel (Plaintiff) |
|
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON JOEY PHELPS, AN INDIVIDUAL | |
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DAVID SEELINGER, AN INDIVIDUAL | |
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON EMPIRE CLS WORLDWIDE CHAUFFEURED SERVICES, AKA EMPIRE CLS, LOS ANGELES LLC, AND EMPIRE CLS, AND EMPIRE AND EMPIRE CLS, LOS ANGELES, LTD., AND EMPIRE INTERNATIONAL, LTD. | |
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON GTS HOLDING AKA EMPIRE CLS WORLDWIDE CHAUFFEURED SERVICES AND EMPIRE INTERNATIONAL LTD | |
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Kathleen Evans-Fogel (Plaintiff) |
|
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint Filed by Kathleen Evans-Fogel (Plaintiff) |
|
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event | FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. RETALIATION IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE 1102.5 ECT | |
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 42 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Matter continued) - |
|
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 15 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Kathleen Evans-Fogel (Plaintiff) |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event | PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6) | |
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR: 1. RETALIATION IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE 1102.5; ETC | |
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Kathleen Evans-Fogel (Plaintiff) |
|