Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sanders Collie R., Sanders Doretha M., filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Duran Manuel, Travillion Tiffany N, against Defined Benefit Pension Plan #001, Elster Inc., Leon Elster A California Corp., Leon Elster Inc., Wexler Judith, (total of 5) See All represented by Elster Aaron Esq., Kaplan Jerry Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth R. Feffer presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 27, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions317 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJury Verdict |
Case Cycle Time557 days |
Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Document:Brief-Supplemental Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-10-26T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Document:Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Document:Defendant's Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Document:Verdict-Special Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Document:Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00Document:Supplemental Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-09T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: May 10, 2017Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Document:Ex-parte Request for Order Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Document:Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-26T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-09T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-09T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Document:Certificate of Mailing Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: May 10, 2017Document:Receipt for Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-10-13T00:00:00Document:Defendant's Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-09T00:00:00Document:Receipt for Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: January 09, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE?CIVIL
Date: March 13, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: January 09, 2017ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL
Date: March 02, 2017ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: May 10, 2017Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by COLLIE R. SANDERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-07-09T00:00:00Ex-parte Request for Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Complaint Filed by COLLIE R. SANDERS (Plaintiff); DORETHA M. SANDERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by COLLIE R. SANDERS (Plaintiff); DORETHA M. SANDERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees Filed by COLLIE R. SANDERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Summons Filed by COLLIE R. SANDERS (Plaintiff); DORETHA M. SANDERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees Filed by DORETHA M. SANDERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00Witness List Filed by COLLIE R. SANDERS (Plaintiff); DORETHA M. SANDERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by COLLIE R. SANDERS (Plaintiff); DORETHA M. SANDERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by ELSTER INC., (Defendant)
Date: 2015-09-09T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-26T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Brief Filed by COLLIE R. SANDERS (Plaintiff); DORETHA M. SANDERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-10-26T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-10-13T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by COLLIE R. SANDERS (Plaintiff); DORETHA M. SANDERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Court
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Judgment Filed by COLLIE R. SANDERS (Plaintiff); DORETHA M. SANDERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Order Filed by COLLIE R. SANDERS (Plaintiff); DORETHA M. SANDERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Receipt Filed by COLLIE R. SANDERS (Plaintiff); DORETHA M. SANDERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Receipt for Exhibits Filed by COLLIE R. SANDERS (Plaintiff); DORETHA M. SANDERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by ELSTER INC., (Defendant)
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Ex-parte Request for Order
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2015-04-27T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-07-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-07-09T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Supplemental Proof of Service
Date: 2015-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-09-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2015-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-10-26T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-10-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2015-10-26T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by DORETHA M. SANDERS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-07-09T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Receipt for Exhibits
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2016-12-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Brief-Supplemental
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Receipt for Exhibits
Date: 2016-11-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing - Attachment
Date: May 10, 2017Order
Date: May 10, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.