Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bianca Herrera, Manuel Ortega, Norma Mendoza, Herrera Bianca, Mendoza Norma, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Aguirre Robert, Robert Aguirre, represented by Law Offices Of Stephen E. Ensberg, Nancy Skouholt, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with Lawrence Cho presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLawrence Cho Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial673 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions754 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court |
Case Cycle Time754 days |
Document:Brief Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2015-06-04T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-02T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: May 31, 2017Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: May 15, 2017Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Document:Opposition Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: April 25, 2017PLAINTIFF BIANCA HERRERA'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND ETC.
Date: July 06, 2016DECLARATION OF ROBERT AGUIRRE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DEEMED ADMISSIONS
Date: August 18, 2016PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER RELIEVING DEFENDANT ROBERT AGUIRRE PROM DEEMED ADMISSIONS
Date: September 12, 2016ORDER RE: MOTION FOR ORDER RELIEVING DEFENDANT ROBERT AGUIRRE FROM DEEMED ADMISSIONS
Date: September 23, 2016DEFENDANT AGUIRRE'S MOTION FOR NONSUIT; ETC.
Date: February 23, 2017OPPOSTION TO MOTION FOR NONSUIT; ETC.
Date: February 27, 2017Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-07-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-06-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-08-02T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-02-03T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Brief (PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF RE: WAIVER OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE, IS FILED THIS DATE. )
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Brief (DEFENDANT'S BRIEF RE: WAIVER OF PRIMARY ASSUMPTION OF THE RISK DOCTRINE, IS FILED THIS DATE. )
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: May 31, 2017Judgment
Date: May 15, 2017Brief
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.