Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Jimenez Elvia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carpenter Zuckerman & Rowley Llp, against Caballero Carlos, Caballero Flora, represented by Seropian Ara O. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 22, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions548 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time555 days |
ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: January 12, 2017Complaint
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-05-13T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-05 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-17 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-10-18T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Order
Date: January 12, 2017Order
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-23 00:00:00
Date: April 23, 2018Exhibit List
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: January 17, 2017Minute order entered: 2016-10-24 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-21 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: March 15, 2017Motion
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.