Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Morales Victor, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by West Coast Trial Lawyers Aplc, against Zambrano Lorena Alvarado, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Patricia D. Nieto presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 21, 2015 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time549 days |
Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-05-18T00:00:00Document:Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by: Judgment Creditor
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Document:Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-05-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-05-18T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2015-05-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-05-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Patricia D. Nieto 8:30 am | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 91 (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Dismissed - Other 549 Days | |
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Patricia D. Nieto 8:30 am | |
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-10-21 00:00:00 | |
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 91 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Patricia D. Nieto 10:00 am | |
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-10-04 00:00:00 | |
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.