Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Alvarez Francis, Alvarez Monte Henry Jr., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations Llc, Ted Jones Ford Inc., Byson Luke, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Berman Jacob P., Braugh Jane Margaret Esq., O'Leary Daniel Morgan, Ozzello Mark A., against Alvarez Francis, Bridgestone Americas Holding Inc., Bridgestone Americas Inc., Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations Llc, Bridgestone Firestone Inc., (total of 11) See All represented by Braugh Jane Margaret Esq., Larson Arnold Douglas Esq., Mckinnon Ashton Leslie, Platt Warren Earl, Vanis Richard William Jr., (total of 11) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Daniel J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management1520 days |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2015 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1253 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Other - joint status conference statement; Filed by:
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Summons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order Modified Stipulation and Protective Order; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Summons on Cross-Complaint; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Document:Cross-complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Objection Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement; Filed by:
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Bob Remy (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant & X-Deft
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service by Moving Party Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Document:Request Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Summons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service by Moving Party Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Document:Association of Attorney Filed by: ATTORNEY for Defendant and Cross-Compl
Date: 2015-10-28T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Document:Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by: Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Document:First Amended Cross Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Document:Notice-Related Cases Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Trial Setting Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Document:Summons Issued Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: TED JONES FORD, INC. [DOE 2] (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal With Prejudice; Filed by: Jerome Gonzalez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Message Board Posting Re: Notice of Continuance of March 10, 2020, hearing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: September 21, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 10, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: August 10, 2017Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS
Date: July 12, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND CROSS...)
Date: September 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL STATUS CONFERENCE RE PLEADING FOR CROSS-MOTIONS FOR ...)
Date: November 26, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: December 16, 2019Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: December 16, 2019Answer - To Cross-Complaint
Date: October 10, 2018Cross-Complaint -
Date: October 10, 2018Summons - Summons on Cross-Complaint
Date: October 23, 2018Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, COMPLAINT
Date: January 04, 2019Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: June 10, 2019Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: June 12, 2019Answer - FORD MOTOR COMPANY'S TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S UNVERIFIED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: July 12, 2019Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)
Date: September 17, 2019Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: Merced County Department of Child Support Services (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: TED JONES FORD, INC. [DOE 2] (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Document:Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2015-08-18T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Document:Association of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-03-18T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Answer To Cross-Complaint; Filed by: TED JONES FORD, INC. [DOE 2] (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Message Board Posting Re: Continued Hearing set for ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 01, 2022Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Notice of change of Firm Address and Phone Numbers Filed by TED JONES FORD, INC. [DOE 2] (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement Filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Monte Henry Alvarez, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Summons Filed by Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Summons Issued Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Bob Remy (Defendant)
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Bridgestone Americas Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Jerome Gonzalez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Notice Filed by Cross-Defendant
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Bob Remy (Defendant)
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Ford Motor Company (Defendant)
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Answer Filed by Monte Henry Alvarez, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Request Filed by COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP, INC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00First Amended Cross Complaint Filed by Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Ex-Parte Proceedings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Reply to Motion Filed by Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings to Continue Trial and all Related Dates)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by TED JONES FORD, INC. [DOE 2] (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Response Filed by Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Monte Henry Alvarez, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint) Filed by TED JONES FORD, INC. [DOE 2] (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Answer (To Cross-Complaint) Filed by TED JONES FORD, INC. [DOE 2] (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by TED JONES FORD, INC. [DOE 2] (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review RE: PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEES FOR ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complainant's Unverified Cross-Complaint) Filed by Ford Motor Company (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Objection Filed by Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Summons Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Bob Remy (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by TED JONES FORD, INC. [DOE 2] (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP, INC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Cross-Defendant
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by James Benjamin Kamanski, Esq. (Attorney)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by TED JONES FORD, INC. [DOE 2] (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Application
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-07-20T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2015-08-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2015-10-28T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-04 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Request
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Summons (on Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Judgment (re: Cross-Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Answer (To Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (of electronic service)
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Order Continuing OSC)
Date: 2018-11-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (with prejudice, complaint)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Notice of change of Firm Address and Phone Numbers
Date: 2018-12-31T00:00:00Notice (of Association of Counsel for Cross-Defendant ted Jones, Inc. dba Ken Grody Ford)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00First Amended Notice of Change of Firm Address and Phone Numbers
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review RE: PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEES FOR ...))
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Miguel Chapa in Support of Cross-Complaints' Renewal of Miguel Chapa's Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Status Conference))
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Declaration (of Jane M. Braugh re: Annual renewal of pro hac vice admission of Jason P. Hoelscher)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (of First Amended Cross-Complaint of Ted Jones Ford, Inc. dba Ken Grody Ford)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complainant's Unverified Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File First Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service Summons
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint of Ted Jones Ford, Inc. DBA Ken Grody Ford
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Cross...))
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Order (for Admission of Attorney Chad M. Lieberman, Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Stipulation RE Extension of Five-Year Rule to Decemeber 31, 2020
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Status Conference re Pleading for Cross-Motions for ...))
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/14/2019)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order Continuing the Trial Date)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Ex-Parte Proceedings))
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Report on Meet and Confer Regarding Certain Affirmative Defenses
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Ken Grody Ford's Opposition to Ford's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Jeffrey L. O'Hara)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service])
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Matthew W. Bauer)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of David E. Harris)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Catherine G. Bryan)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Justin M. Vogel)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Order (for Admission of Attorney Justin M. Vogel, Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Order (re: Cross-Complainants' Notice and Application to Admit David E. Harris Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Order (for Admission of Attorney Jeffrey L. O'Hara, Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings to Continue Trial and all Related Dates))
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Order (for Admission of Attorney Matthew W. Bauer, Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Order (for Admission of Attorney Catherine G. Bryan, Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Proof of Service Summons Filed by Jerome Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Luke Byson (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Bob Remy (Defendant)
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Notice Filed by Cross-Defendant
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Ford Motor Company (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon Filed by Jerome Gonzalez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Status Conference re Pleading for Cross-Motions for ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00Notice Filed by Monte Henry Alvarez, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-03-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Cross...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Application Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Arnold Douglas Larson, Esq. (Attorney)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Cross-Complainant
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jerome Gonzalez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Jerome Gonzalez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Bridgestone/Firestone, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Response Filed by COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP, INC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Monte Henry Alvarez, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Re: Notice of Continuance of March 10, 2020, hearing)
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Timothy J. McCoy, CSR #4745)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment of ...))
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of John P. Lacey)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action [REDACTED]
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Parts of the Petition to Approve Co...))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Order (for Admission of Attorney John P. Lacey, Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Order (Re: Cross-Complainants' Notice and Motion for Court to Issue Nunc Pro Tunc Order)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Motion for Order Sealing Parts of the Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (with prejudice, cross-complaint by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Cross-Complainants' Notice and Motion for Court to Issue Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED, filing date of Cross-Complaint does not match the court's record.)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (with prejudice, cross complaint filed by Ted Jones Ford, Inc. dba Ken Grody Ford)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re OSC re Dismissal))
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (with prejudice)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (with prejudice)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00First Amended Cross Complaint
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Judgment (re: Cross-Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Jane M. Braugh re: Annual renewal of pro hac vice admission of Jason P. Hoelscher)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Report on Meet and Confer Regarding Certain Affirmative Defenses
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Parts of the Petition to Approve Co...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice) Filed by Monte Henry Alvarez, Jr. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Request For Dismissal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re OSC re Dismissal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Lien Filed by Merced County Department of Child Support Services (Non-Party)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: April 01, 2022Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment of ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: April 01, 2022Message Board Posting (Re: Continued Hearing set for ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by Cross-Complainant
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Re: Notice of Continuance of March 10, 2020, hearing) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.