Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rok Group International Limited, Safer Schools For America Inc., filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Law Offices Of Michaeline A. Re, against Melendez Robert, Sandoval Andrew, Triebels Ronaldo, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with William F. Fahey presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management111 days |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2015 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions178 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time178 days |
Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2015-08-18T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-09-08T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-05-27T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2015-08-10T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-08-18T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2015-10-16T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2015-08-18T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-05-22T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-09-14T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2015-10-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-05-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2015-08-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-08-05T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2015-08-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-09-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-08-26T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2015-08-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2015-08-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-09-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2015-10-28T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-04-25 00:00:00 | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial William Fahey 10:00 am | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-04-11 00:00:00 | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference William Fahey 9:30 am | |
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) - Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 69 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Ruling on Submitted Matter William Fahey 4:05 pm | |
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-03-15 00:00:00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.