Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HECTOR M GUZMAN VS CENTURY SEWING COMPANY INC ET AL
On April 21, 2015 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Howard L. Halm presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 21, 2015
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Hector M. Guzman;Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year and 23 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 93 (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
in Department 93 (OSC-Failure to File Request for Dism; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL | |
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Hector M\. Guzman (Plaintiff) |
|
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Association of Attorney Filed by Hector M\. Guzman (Plaintiff) |
|
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Hector M\. Guzman (Plaintiff) |
|
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS | |
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Century Sewing Company, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed by Century Sewing Company, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Century Sewing Company, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
June 03, 2015 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY | |
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT-PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH AMENDED (NUMBER): 1 | |
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed by Hector M\. Guzman (Plaintiff) |
|
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint Filed by Hector M\. Guzman (Plaintiff) |
|
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event | 1ST AMENDMENT SUMMONS | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Hector M\. Guzman (Plaintiff) |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) |