Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ANNE ULRICH ET AL VS JASON HYMES MD ET AL
On April 29, 2015 a medical malpractice - physicians & surgeons (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Randolph M. Hammock presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 29, 2015
Last Refreshed
October 20, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Howard L. Halm;Category
Medical Malpractice - Physicians & Surgeons (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Malpractice
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Jury Verdict
Case Duration
1 year, 6 months and 3 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2018-04-30 00:00:00 | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Randolph M. Hammock 8:30 am | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 93 (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) - (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 93 (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Randolph M. Hammock 8:30 am | |
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Dismissed - Other 551 Days | |
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-10-31 00:00:00 | |
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 93 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) - Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 93 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Randolph M. Hammock 10:00 am | |
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2016-10-12 00:00:00 | |
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 93 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) - Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) - |
|
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 93 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) - |
|
May 04, 2015 | hearing | Calendaring:Final Status Conference Howard L\. Halm | |
May 04, 2015 | hearing | Calendaring:Jury Trial Howard L\. Halm | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Filed/Opened:Med Malpractice (Drs & Surgeons) | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Anne Ulrich (Plaintiff); Marc Ramhorst (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Anne Ulrich (Plaintiff); Marc Ramhorst (Plaintiff) |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Anne Ulrich (Plaintiff); Marc Ramhorst (Plaintiff) |
|