Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Bikmayev Maksim, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gilburg Alexander E. Esq., against Does 1 To 25, Eida Alon Allen, Eida Edna, Eida Maxim, represented by Gilbury Alexander Law Office Of, Miller Jennifer E. Esq., Shaver Korff & Castronovo Llp Law O O, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank Courthouse with Benny C. Osorio presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 29, 2015 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseBurbank Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time915 days |
Notice, Association of Counsel
Date: 2016-05-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 30, 2017Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: March 23, 2017Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2015-05-01T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-11-05T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2016-05-03T00:00:00Receipt (jury fees $150 )
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 23, 2017Complaint
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-05-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Answer to Complaint
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI
Date: 2017-01-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION;__ )
Date: October 30, 2017Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 23, 2017Notice-Settlement
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.