Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
VALORIE ZAGELBAUM VS NEW DIRECTIONS INC
On April 24, 2015 a wrongful termination (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Michael P. Linfield presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 24, 2015
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Wrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
Wrongful Termination
Case Outcome Type
Court-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other)
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year and 13 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 34 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 34 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 34 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING COURT DARK | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE | |
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 34 Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Denied) - |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Plaintiff |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 34 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Department 34 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NEW DIRECTIONS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CAUSES OF ACTION AND CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATIONS OF STACEY S | |
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Statement of Facts Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NEW DIRECTIONS, INC.'S APPENDIX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CAUSES OF ACTION AND CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES | |
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NEW DIRECTIONS, INC.'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND REFERENCES TO SUPPORTING EVII)ENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CAUSES OF ACTION AND CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DA | |
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER THEREON | |
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order-Protective Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT NEW DIRECTIONS, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR NINETY (90) DAYS | |
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 34 Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Trial continued) - |
|
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NEW DIRECTIONS, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR NINETY (90) DAYS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF SUMITHRA R. ROBERTS, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THEREOF | |
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) - |
|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE | |
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 34 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) - |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Valorie Zagelbaum (Plaintiff) |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by New Directions, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
August 03, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Valorie Zagelbaum (Plaintiff) |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by New Directions, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT | |
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Cert of Acknowledgment Filed by Valorie Zagelbaum (Plaintiff) |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
in Department 19 Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event | PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO ASSIGNED JUDGE [CCP SECTION 170.6] | |
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION BASED ON DISABILITY IN VIOLATION 0F GOVERNMENT CODE 12940, ET SEQ. (FEHA); ETC | |
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Valorie Zagelbaum (Plaintiff) |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |