Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yalanska Aza, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Barry K. Rothman, against Zadeh Parsa T., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Dalila Corral Lyons presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management147 days |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 2015 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time97 days |
Complaint
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: May 21, 2015Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-05-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: July 16, 2015Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: June 08, 2015Memorandum of Costs
Date: July 23, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.