Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gulley Gary, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Foley Crystal Gayle, against Cbs Corporation Fka Viacom Inc. Successor By Merger With Cbs Corporation Fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Certain-Teed Corporation, Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc., Ford Motor Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, (total of 14) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with David S. Cunningham presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 06, 2015 |
CategoryAsbestos- Personal Injury/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time912 days |
Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: December 28, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: September 18, 2018Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/16/2019)
Date: July 16, 2019Complaint
Date: April 06, 2015Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: July 16, 2019Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: December 06, 2018Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: January 18, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.