Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Gurrola Diana, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Bunch Bruce M. Esq., Law Offices Of Aaron S. Bregman, against Ascough Bruce M. M.D., Does 1 To 50, Hooshang Semnani M.D., Mirza Farrukh Md, Northridge Hospital Medical Center, (total of 5) See All represented by Carroll Kelly Trotter Franzen Mckenna &, Mayer Patrick W. Esq., Packer Robert B. Esq., Schaeffer James C., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Benny C. Osorio presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 06, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions224 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time704 days |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 17, 2017Complaint
Date: 2015-04-06T00:00:00Application-Miscellaneous (FOR DIANA GURROLA GUARDIAN AD LITEM )
Date: 2015-05-27T00:00:00Application
Date: 2015-05-27T00:00:00Application-Miscellaneous (FOR DIANA GURROLA GUARDIAN AD LITEM(COPY) )
Date: 2015-05-12T00:00:00Application
Date: 2015-05-12T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2015-05-21T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem (FOR DIANA GURROLA )
Date: 2015-05-21T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem (FOR DIANA GURROLA )
Date: 2015-06-04T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-06-05T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-07-09T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2015-07-22T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2015-06-04T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial (ON BEHALF OF DIGNITY HEALTH )
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-07-09T00:00:00Summons Filed
Date: 2015-06-05T00:00:00Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt
Date: 2015-07-22T00:00:00Order (RE: DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT BRUCE M. ASCOUGH, M.D. )
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint (ON BEHALF OF DIGNITY HEALTH )
Date: 2015-12-09T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (re: 11-16-15 )
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Declaration (OF TRIAL ATTORNEY )
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-12-09T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00Summons Filed (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT )
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES )
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI (1st cont. )
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-04-05T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Ord-Approving Compromise
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Notice (OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY )
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT )
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT )
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00Petition-Hrg Minor's Compromise (AS TO MINOR: DIANA GURROLA 161229184216 1/31/2017 01:30 pm )
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney (ON BEHALF OF DIGNITY HEALTH dba NHMC )
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-03-04T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2016-12-29T00:00:00Notice-Settlement
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES )
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (HOOSHANG SEMNANI, M.D. )
Date: 2016-04-05T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (PROOF OF PURCHASE OF ANNUITY )
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: March 07, 2017Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT BRUCE M. ASCOUGH, M.D. ONLY )
Date: 2017-03-07T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: March 17, 2017Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: March 17, 2017Request for Dismissal
Date: March 10, 2017Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION )
Date: March 10, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.