Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Amanda Brown Artist Management Inc., filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Levine John Warren Esq., against Amanda Brown Artist Management Inc., Bubblefish Media Inc. Doe 1, Kerzner Lee, Welch Veronica, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mel Red Recana presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management130 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2015 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial2187 days |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions579 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Document:Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-03-24T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Document:Statement of Decision Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-04-14T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-02-26T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-01-30T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Former Attorney for Pltf/PetnFAP
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Declaration of demurring party; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Document:Motion for Leave Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Lee Kerzner (Defendant); Veronica Welch (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Document:Proof-Personal Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Reply in Support of Motion to Strike; Filed by: Veronica Welch (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Amanda Brown Artist Management, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lee Kerzner (Defendant); Veronica Welch (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Notice of continuance of case management conference; Filed by:
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Document:Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Lee Kerzner (Defendant); Veronica Welch (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Reply in Support of Demurrer to SAC; Filed by: Veronica Welch (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Order demurrer sustained; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Lee Kerzner (Defendant); Veronica Welch (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Veronica Welch (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Veronica Welch (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Order Re: Ruling on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued NOA: B313949; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Veronica Welch (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Bubblefish Media, Inc. Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Amanda Brown Artist Management, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Amanda Brown Artist Management, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Declaration of Thomas K. Richards; Filed by: Bubblefish Media, Inc. Doe 1 (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Exhibit List (REVISED #2); Filed by: Amanda Brown Artist Management, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Veronica Welch (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Tentative Decision; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for New Trial: Filed By: Veronica Welch (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Statement of Decision; Filed by: Amanda Brown Artist Management, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Order Re: Ruling on Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Order Re: Ruling on Proposed Judgment and Proposed Statement of Decision; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Amanda Brown Artist Management, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Trial Brief (Post-Trial Brief); Filed by: Amanda Brown Artist Management, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Veronica Welch (Appellant)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: Veronica Welch (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Objection to Proposed Statement of Decision and Judgment; Filed by: Veronica Welch (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance NOA: B313949; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Trial Brief (Closing Brief); Filed by: Veronica Welch (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal B313949, NA06-30-21; PER 8.140(b); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 23, 2021Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B313949; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: April 10, 2017Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: July 29, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: August 21, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 08, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 20, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 11, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 14, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 25, 2021NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: February 01, 2018OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: February 02, 2018REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; OBJECTION TO LATE-FILED OPPOSITION
Date: February 07, 2018Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Lee Kerzner (Defendant); Veronica Welch (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Order Re: Ruling on Demurer to Second Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Order Re: Ruling on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Defendants; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE "C" RE: LAWSUITS AGAINST PLAINTIFF
Date: February 21, 2018INDEX TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE "A"-"C"
Date: February 21, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE "B" RE: PRIOR VACATED JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS
Date: February 21, 2018OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE "C" RE: DOCUMENTS NOT PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY OR ADVANCE OF TRIAL
Date: February 26, 2018OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE "A" ETC.
Date: February 26, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLANT, ETC
Date: July 09, 2018DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 27, 2018Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: November 20, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Trial Setting...)
Date: February 14, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: May 28, 2019Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: May 28, 2019Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: July 29, 2019Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: July 29, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: September 11, 2019Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: September 11, 2019Order - ORDER RE: RULING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: September 11, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS' MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: September 11, 2019Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: November 01, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); TRI...)
Date: November 08, 2019Order - ORDER RE: RULING ON DEMURER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: November 08, 2019Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: March 20, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED COURT HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: March 24, 2020Order - ORDER RE: RULING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS
Date: August 06, 2020Order - ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: August 06, 2020Motion for New Trial
Date: May 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL)
Date: June 16, 2021Order - ORDER RE: RULING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: June 17, 2021AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: July 26, 2018Reply - Reply Reply in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint
Date: February 08, 2019Opposition - Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint
Date: February 01, 2019Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 21, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 17, 2019Declaration
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Application
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-25 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-10T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Complaint (1st)
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Receipt of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Demurrer)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Order (demurrer sustained)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Trial Setting...))
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance re: Hearing on Defendants' Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 09/11/2019)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2015-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-04-14T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2015-03-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-05-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-06-09 00:00:00
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-09-16 00:00:00
Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2015-12-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-07 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-02 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-08 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-10 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-10T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Statement of Decision
Date: 2016-08-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-04-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-09-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-12T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Trial Setting...))
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Notice (of Order Granting Attorneys' Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Order (Re: Ruling on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Tri...))
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Demurrer to SAC)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Order (Re: Ruling on Demurer to Second Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/16/2020)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/23/2020)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED COURT HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel of Thomas K. Rich...))
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Order (Re: Ruling on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Defendants)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Order (Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Order (Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Operative Answer to the Opera...))
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why the Operative Answer to the Opera...))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC); Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice (TO DEFENDANT LEE KERZNER TO ATTEND TRIAL AND BRING DOCUMENTS)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Exhibit List ((REVISED #2))
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Exhibit List (PLAINTIFF?S EXHIBIT LIST (REVISED))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Trial Brief ((Post-Trial Brief))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Trial Brief ((Closing Brief))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/12/2021)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/26/2021)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Objection (to Proposed Statement of Decision and Judgment)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Tentative Decision Per CRC 3.1590(a)(b)(c)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Order (Re: Ruling on Proposed Judgment and Proposed Statement of Decision)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/19/2021)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/15/2021)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Statement of Decision
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Order (Re: Ruling on Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance (NOA: 06/30/21 B313949)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued (NOA: 06/30/21 B313949)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF ANDREW WILLIAMS, ESQ. IN SUPPORT MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Motion for New Trial
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF AARON DEL ROSARIO, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL)
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial))
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B313949)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/23/2021)
Date: December 23, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: December 23, 2021Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (B313949, NA06-30-21; PER 8.140(b))
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/07/2021)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 06/17/2021)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Notice (TO ATTEND TRIAL AND BRING DOCUMENTS)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-04-10T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/18/2019)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Thomas K. Richards)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (Revised))
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Court Order)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.