Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Maple Leaf Capital Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Law Offices Of Fredrick H. Stern, against Chicago Title Insurance Company, Chicago Title Company, represented by Hennelly & Grossfeld Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth Allen White presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Allen White Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage (Not Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time174 days |
Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2015-06-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-01-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-05-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: June 12, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-04-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: June 23, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.