Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Baker Ken, Brown Carl, Brown Melissa, Busby Edward, Busby Reta, (total of 69) See All filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Lytle John, Mitchell Wendy Aline, Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik & Assoc. Llp, West James Lloyd, against Amylin Pharmaceuticals Llc Fka Amylin Pharmaceuticals Inc., Eli Lilly And Company, Mckesson Corporation, Merck & Co. Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., (total of 7) See All represented by Chandrasoma Kelsey Ann, Hernandez Don A., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with William F. Highberger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam F. Highberger Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryClaims Involving Mass Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time30 days |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: March 18, 2022Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: February 18, 2022Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: February 18, 2022Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: February 18, 2022Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: September 16, 2022Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: September 16, 2022Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: September 21, 2022Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: September 21, 2022Order - ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL
Date: November 16, 2022Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-22 00:00:00
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-01-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (of Wendy A. Mitchell, Esq.)
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Appearance (of James West, Esq.)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-01-28T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.