Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
G&L Group Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Firm Van Antwerp Law, against Paige Corrine Brown, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Teresa Sanchez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeresa Sanchez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management110 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions51 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time376 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL
Date: August 10, 2016Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: August 10, 2016Default Entered
Date: 2015-02-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-06-16 00:00:00
Date: 2015-06-16T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-09-14 00:00:00
Date: 2015-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-04-20 00:00:00
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-01 00:00:00
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-11 00:00:00
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2015-10-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-12-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2015-10-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2015-10-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-08 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-12-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-08-10T00:00:00Writ-Other Issued
Date: February 10, 2017Minute order entered: 2016-01-11 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00Writ issued
Date: March 06, 2017Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Writ-Other Issued
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-01-18T00:00:00Writ of Execution
Date: May 24, 2018Declaration
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-18 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-11 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-02-03T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Writ-Other Issued
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-08 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00Cost Bill After Judgment
Date: August 30, 2017Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: November 07, 2017Appl for Writ of Execution & Ord
Date: February 23, 2017Minute order entered: 2016-08-19 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Writ-Other Issued
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.