Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Clean Energy Of America Group Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rothman Larry Esq., against Southland Electrical Contractors Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rafael A. Ongkeko presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management342 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions226 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-04-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-08-25T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-10-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-07-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Larry, Rothman, Esq. (Attorney)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Default Judgment Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Proposed Amended Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Declaration of Larry Rothman; Filed by: Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Proposed Amended Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 09, 2021Default Judgment Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-09-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-09-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Document:Writ issued Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Partial Dismissal(not entire case) Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-12-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Southland Electrical Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Answer Filed by Southland Electrical Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Writ issued Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Southland Electrical Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Appl for Writ of Execution & Ord Filed by Creditor
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Southland Electrical Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00Order Filed by Southland Electrical Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Southland Electrical Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by Southland Electrical Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Court
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Notice Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Proposed Amended Judgment) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Default Judgment Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Motion to Amend Judgment ((Res ID: 8866)) Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00Writ of Execution Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment (Res ID: 1018))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment (Res ID: 1018))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Proposed Amended Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Larry Rothman, Esq. (Attorney)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment (Res ID:...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Proposed Amended Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: February 09, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Declaration (OF LARRY ROTHMAN) Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Proposed Amended Judgment) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: February 09, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: February 09, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion - Other)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: February 26, 2021Minute order entered: 2018-09-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Judgment (AMENDED JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)) Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: February 09, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Motion to Amend Judgment ((Res ID: 1018)) Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Declaration (of Larry Rothman) Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Entry of the Amended Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-04-29 00:00:00
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-09-30 00:00:00
Date: 2015-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-07-28 00:00:00
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Partial Dismissal(not entire case)
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2015-08-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-10-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-07 00:00:00
Date: 2015-12-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-11-20 00:00:00
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-21 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Writ issued
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Appl for Writ of Execution & Ord
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-20 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2016-10-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-03 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-01 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion - Other))
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Writ of Execution
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Larry Rothman)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Brief ([Supplemental] in Support of Motion to Amend Judgment)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Motion to Amend Judgment ((Res ID: 8866))
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-28 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Motion to Amend Judgment ((Res ID: 1018))
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Declaration (OF LARRY ROTHMAN)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment (Res ID:...))
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-11-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Judgment AMENDED JUDGMENT (PROPOSED); Filed by: Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: February 09, 2021Document:Default Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-03-22 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal(not entire case) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-13T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Document:Default Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00Document:Appl for Writ of Execution & Ord Filed by: Attorney for Creditor
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 09, 2021Declaration OF LARRY ROTHMAN; Filed by: Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Document:Order to Appear for Examination Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Document:Writ of Execution filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-12-21T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-12-01T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-02-15T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Document:Default Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-10-20T00:00:00Document:Order to Appear for Examination Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 26, 2021Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Clean Energy of America Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment (Res ID: 1018)))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Motion to Amend Judgment
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.