Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ally Financial Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vanlochem & Associates Llp, Hunt Michael S. Esq., against Serrano Alfredo, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Frederick C. Shaller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick C. Shaller Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions64 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time219 days |
Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-01-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2015-01-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-03-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-07-08T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2015-03-05T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2015-03-06T00:00:00Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)
Date: 2015-01-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Application
Date: 2015-01-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-02-10T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: September 07, 2015Declaration
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 09, 2018Order
Date: 2015-08-07T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: September 23, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.