Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jenkins Lauren, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Lawyers For Justice Pc, against Check Into Cash Of California Inc., represented by Liberatore Frank M. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mark V. Mooney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark V. Mooney Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial439 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time414 days |
Opposition Document
Date: 2015-04-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-03-10T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-04-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-03-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-01-20T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-02-06T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-05-06T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-08-12T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-10-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2015-08-20T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-07-09T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-07-16T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: February 04, 2016Reply/Response
Date: 2015-10-16T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-08-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-02-03T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-06-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-10-16T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-08-20T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-02-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: February 18, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.