Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rivas Gregorio, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Robert H. London, against Coldwell Banker Commercial Doe 1, East Valley Hospital Medical Center, represented by White Christopher A. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Marc D. Gross presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarc D. Gross Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryPremises Liability (E.G.Slip & Fall) (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial603 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions504 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time1148 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (AMENDED)
Date: August 15, 2016Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 15, 2016Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2016-03-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-02-03T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-03-22T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2016-03-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-03-08T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2016-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2016-06-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.