Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Monreal Maria, Monreal Larry, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Strategic Legal Practices Apc, against General Motors Llc, represented by Ruben David N. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Soussan G. Bruguera presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSoussan G. Bruguera Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management86 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time181 days |
Receipt
Date: 2015-03-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2015-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-02-13T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-03-24T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: June 11, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: June 30, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.