Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Baron Kenneth, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Toveq Isaac, against Pardee Homes Inc., represented by Koeller Nebeker Carlson & Haluck Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Daniel S. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel S. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management576 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions590 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time904 days |
Proof of Service -
Date: July 13, 2016Proof of Service -
Date: July 29, 2016Proof of Service -
Date: August 02, 2016Proof of Service -
Date: October 04, 2016Proof of Service -
Date: December 06, 2016MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE
Date: August 12, 2016Proof of Service -
Date: November 17, 2016ORDER RE: DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2016SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 29, 2016DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 17, 2016COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: December 19, 2016Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2015-01-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-04-03T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-02-23T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2016-07-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court)
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.