Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Orozco Marisa, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Tobin * Lucks Llp, against Romantix Inc, represented by Mackin Kevin Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Randolph M. Hammock presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandolph M. Hammock Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryPremises Liability (E.G.Slip & Fall) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time670 days |
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2016Answer
Date: 2015-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 31, 2016Complaint
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2016-09-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-01-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: November 10, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.