Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez Silvia, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Duran Percy, against Carnell Rodgers & Associates, Evergreen Realty, Lopez Connie, Options Escrow, Rodgers Carnell, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mary H. Strobel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary H. Strobel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time209 days |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2015-01-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: August 12, 2015Minute order entered: 2015-06-15 00:00:00
Date: 2015-06-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-04-30 00:00:00
Date: 2015-04-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-11-20 00:00:00
Date: November 20, 2015Minute order entered: 2015-07-28 00:00:00
Date: July 28, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.