Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Flores Francisco, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Reisner Adam Esq., against California Commerce Club Inc, Chung Scott, Commerce Casino, represented by Kennedy Tracey Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mitchell L. Beckloff presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMitchell L. Beckloff Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time119 days |
Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2015-01-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-03-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-02-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: April 29, 2015Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2015-04-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: May 11, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.