Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia Ana, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Moon & Yang Apc, against Playa Las Tunas Restaurant Inc., Hernandez Celso, represented by Lance R. Belsome Law Offices Of, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Ruth Ann Kwan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRuth Ann Kwan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management371 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions665 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time665 days |
Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-03-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2015-03-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-01-14T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2015-03-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: February 10, 2016Order
Date: 2015-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: October 03, 2016Notice of Hearing
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 26, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.