Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Johnson Clifford, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Law Office Of Angela Swan, against Department Of Corrections & Rehab., represented by Kamala Harris Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert L. Hess presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 10, 2014 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions407 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time407 days |
Minute order entered: 2015-07-09 00:00:00
Date: 2015-07-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-07-01T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2014-12-12T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2014-12-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-10T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-06-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-10-22 00:00:00
Date: 2015-10-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-12-31 00:00:00
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Voiding of Filing
Date: 2015-01-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-01-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-03-26T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-03-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-04-15 00:00:00
Date: 2015-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-03-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-08-03 00:00:00
Date: 2015-08-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-11-16 00:00:00
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-03 00:00:00
Date: 2015-12-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-11-17T00:00:00Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer
Date: 2015-12-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-21 00:00:00
Date: January 21, 2016Minute order entered: 2015-12-11 00:00:00
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Order
Date: January 21, 2016Judgment
Date: February 18, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.