Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Martinez Lorena, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Law Office Of Hussein Saleh, against Regal Cinemas Inc., represented by Law Offices Of Nancy A. Halas, Monteleone Anna J. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Patricia D. Nieto presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 10, 2014 |
CategoryPremises Liability (E.G.Slip & Fall) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time708 days |
General Denial
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-01-08T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-12-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: November 17, 2016Notice of Ruling
Date: September 27, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.